House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (103-30) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {753926/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {663320/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/20/2021 | Pre-filed |