House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed 47-0 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Third Reading Passed (123-0) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |