House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (93-29) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (33-14) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {363225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (98-33) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {823623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |