Senate | 04/09/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (88-44) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Rejected | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Floor Committee Amendment {633124/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {253623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |