LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Maryland MD
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB707
Action History
MD
Maryland House Bill HB707
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Maryland 2022 Regular Session
Maryland House Bill HB707
Action History
Senate
03/21/2022
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
House
03/18/2022
Third Reading Passed (93-36)
House
03/17/2022
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
House
03/17/2022
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House
02/02/2022
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House
01/31/2022
First Reading Ways and Means