Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (100-34) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Floor Amendment {593620/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Saab) Adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |