House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {263221/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (137-1) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {813525/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |