House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Griffith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Griffith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {633322/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713323/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |