House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-1) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {203129/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {153122/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |