Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB725 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/04/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0725*  
  
HOUSE BILL 725 
O4, F5   	2lr1345 
    	CF SB 506 
By: Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, Griffith, Guyton, and Solomon 
Introduced and read first time: February 3, 2022 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Therapeutic Child Care Program to provide specialized 3 
child care and early childhood education by educators, early intervention providers, 4 
mental health providers, and health care providers to children under a certain age 5 
who have delays in development, physical disabilities, or delays in social, emotional, 6 
or behavioral functioning; and generally relating to the Therapeutic Child Care 7 
Program. 8 
 
BY adding to 9 
 Article – Education 10 
Section 8–420 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Education 16 
 
8–420. 17 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 18 
INDICATED.  19 
 
 (2) “DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS , PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS 20 
IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING” MEANS: 21 
 
 (I) A SIGNIFICANT DEVELOPM ENTAL DELAY OR ATYPI CAL 22 
DEVELOPMENT , AS IDENTIFIED BY A H EALTH PROFESSIONAL , IN: 23  2 	HOUSE BILL 725  
 
 
 
 1. COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT ; 1 
 
 2. PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT ; 2 
 
 3. LANGUAGE AND SPEECH D EVELOPMENT ; 3 
 
 4. PSYCHOSOCIAL DEVELOPM ENT; OR 4 
 
 5. SELF–HELP SKILLS; 5 
 
 (II) PSYCHOLOGICAL TRAUMA , AS IDENTIFIED THROUG H AN 6 
EVALUATION BY A MENT AL HEALTH PROFESSION AL; OR 7 
 
 (III) A DIAGNOSED PHYSICAL , DEVELOPMENTAL , OR MENTAL 8 
HEALTH CONDITION THA T IMPACTS DAILY LIVI NG AND LIMITS PARTIC IPATION IN 9 
TYPICAL EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUC ATION OR CHILD CARE SETTINGS. 10 
 
 (3) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROGRAM. 11 
 
 (B) THERE IS A THERAPEUTIC CHILD CARE PROGRAM IN THE STATE. 12 
 
 (C) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROVIDE SPECIALIZED CHILD 13 
CARE AND EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION BY EDUCATORS , EARLY INTERVENTION 14 
PROVIDERS, MENTAL HEALTH PROVID ERS, AND HEALTH CARE PROV IDERS TO 15 
CHILDREN UNDER THE A GE OF 6 YEARS WHO HAVE : 16 
 
 (1) DEVELOPMENTAL DELAYS ; 17 
 
 (2) PHYSICAL DISABILITIES ; OR 18 
 
 (3) DELAYS IN SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, OR BEHAVIORAL FUNCTI ONING. 19 
 
 (D) (1) SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , FOR FISCAL 20 
YEAR 2024, THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDG ET BILL AN 21 
APPROPRIATION TO THE PROGRAM IN AN AMOUNT NOT LESS THAN THE PE R PUPIL 22 
FUNDING AMOUNT OF $45,000 FOR EACH CHILD SERVE D WHO HAS DEVELOPMEN TAL 23 
DELAYS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIE S, OR DELAYS IN SOCIAL , EMOTIONAL, OR 24 
BEHAVIORAL FUNCTIONI NG. 25 
 
 (2) (I) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, FOR PROVIDERS IN THE PROGRAM 26 
THAT BEGAN PROVIDING CARE TO CHILDREN ON OR BEFORE MARCH 5, 2020, THE 27 
PER PUPIL FUNDING AM OUNT SHALL BE CALCUL ATED USING THE HIGHE R OF: 28   	HOUSE BILL 725 	3 
 
 
 
 1. THE JANUARY 1, 2019, ENROLLMENT ; OR 1 
 
 2. THE JANUARY 1, 2023, ENROLLMENT . 2 
 
 (II) FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024, FOR PROVIDERS IN THE PROGRAM 3 
THAT BEGAN PROVIDING CARE TO CHILDREN AFT ER MARCH 5, 2020, THE PER PUPIL 4 
FUNDING AMOUNT SHALL BE CALCULATED USING THE JANUARY 1, 2023, 5 
ENROLLMENT .  6 
 
 (3) BEGINNING IN FISCAL Y EAR 2025 AND EACH FISCAL YEAR 7 
THEREAFTER , THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCREA SE THE PER PUPIL FUN DING AMOUNT 8 
UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION B Y THE LESSER OF: 9 
 
 (I) THE CONSUMER PRICE INDEX FOR ALL URBAN 10 
CONSUMERS FOR THE WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA, OR ANY SUCCESSOR 11 
INDEX; OR 12 
 
 (II) 1.5%. 13 
 
 (4) THE PROGRAM MAY BE FUNDED FROM: 14 
 
 (I) THE GENERAL FUND OF THE STATE; AND 15 
 
 (II) ANY OTHER SOURCES . 16 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 17 
1, 2022. 18