House | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (99-34) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {503623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |