House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary |