House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (107-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {153426/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {403427/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations |