House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-3) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |