Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB798 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *hb0798*
66
77 HOUSE BILL 798
88 M3, M4, J1 2lr2993
99 HB 1642/20 – HRU
1010 By: Delegate Jalisi
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 3, 2022
1212 Assigned to: Environment and Transportation
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Community Healthy Air Act 2
1919
2020 FOR the purpose of establishing the Committee on Air Quality to create, on or before a 3
2121 certain date, a certain air quality sampling and monitoring protocol for the collection 4
2222 of air quality and public health data associated with certain large–animal feed 5
2323 operations; and generally relating to air pollutant monitoring and the Committee on 6
2424 Air Quality. 7
2525
2626 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8
2727 That: 9
2828
2929 (a) (1) There is a Committee on Air Quality. 10
3030
3131 (2) The Committee consists of the following members: 11
3232
3333 (i) one expert in regulatory compliance, selected by the Office of the 12
3434 Attorney General; and 13
3535
3636 (ii) the following members, selected jointly by the Dean of the 14
3737 University of Maryland School of Public Health and the Dean of the Johns Hopkins 15
3838 Bloomberg School of Public Health: 16
3939
4040 1. one expert in air pollution sampling and monitoring; 17
4141
4242 2. one expert in spatial statistics and monitoring; 18
4343
4444 3. one expert in exposure science; 19
4545
4646 4. one expert in environmental epidemiology; 20
4747
4848 5. one expert in toxicology; 21 2 HOUSE BILL 798
4949
5050
5151
5252 6. one expert in human health risk assessment; and 1
5353
5454 7. one preventive medicine physician. 2
5555
5656 (3) The members of the Committee shall designate the chair of the 3
5757 Committee from among the members of the Committee. 4
5858
5959 (4) The Department of the Environment shall provide staff for the 5
6060 Committee. 6
6161
6262 (5) A member of the Committee: 7
6363
6464 (i) may not receive compensation as a member of the Committee; 8
6565 but 9
6666
6767 (ii) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard 10
6868 State Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 11
6969
7070 (6) (i) On or before January 1, 2023, the Committee shall create an air 12
7171 quality sampling and monitoring protocol for the collection of air quality and public health 13
7272 data associated with large animal–feeding operations as defined by the Department of the 14
7373 Environment in regulation. 15
7474
7575 (ii) The protocol shall establish the methodology for the Department 16
7676 of the Environment to use to: 17
7777
7878 1. quantify the amount of the air pollutants that are emitted 18
7979 from large animal–feeding operations, including emissions of: 19
8080
8181 A. ammonia; 20
8282
8383 B. fine particulate matter; 21
8484
8585 C. coarse particulate matter; 22
8686
8787 D. volatile organic compounds; and 23
8888
8989 E. other air pollutants subject to State or federal laws and 24
9090 regulations related to air pollutant emissions from large animal–feeding operations; and 25
9191
9292 2. assess the public health risks associated with air 26
9393 pollutants emitted from large animal–feeding operations in the State. 27
9494
9595 (iii) In preparing the protocol, the Committee shall: 28
9696
9797 1. identify all air pollutants emitted from lar ge 29 HOUSE BILL 798 3
9898
9999
100100 animal–feeding operations in the State; and 1
101101
102102 2. identify potential public health risks associated with air 2
103103 pollutants emitted from large animal–feeding operations in the State. 3
104104
105105 (7) (i) Subject to subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph, the Committee 4
106106 shall submit the completed protocol for: 5
107107
108108 1. public comment; and 6
109109
110110 2. peer review by a panel composed of experts in the following 7
111111 fields, as selected by the Department of the Environment in consultation with the 8
112112 Committee: 9
113113
114114 A. air pollution monitoring; 10
115115
116116 B. spatial statistics and modeling; 11
117117
118118 C. exposure science; 12
119119
120120 D. environmental epidemiology; 13
121121
122122 E. toxicology; 14
123123
124124 F. human health risk assessment; and 15
125125
126126 G. preventive medicine. 16
127127
128128 (ii) The experts selected for the peer review panel under item 2 of 17
129129 subparagraph (i) of this paragraph may not be a member of the Committee or an employee 18
130130 of the Department of the Environment. 19
131131
132132 (8) On or before April 1, 2023: 20
133133
134134 (i) the Committee shall: 21
135135
136136 1. review the comments received under paragraph (7) of this 22
137137 section; and 23
138138
139139 2. incorporate into the protocol any comments determined by 24
140140 the Committee to be appropriate for inclusion; and 25
141141
142142 (ii) the Department of the Environment shall publish the final 26
143143 protocol on its website. 27
144144
145145 (b) (1) On or before October 1, 2023, the Department of the Environment shall: 28
146146 4 HOUSE BILL 798
147147
148148
149149 (i) use the protocol created under subsection (a)(6) of this section to 1
150150 assess air pollutants and public health risks associated with all large animal–feeding 2
151151 operations in the State; and 3
152152
153153 (ii) use the assessments conducted under item (i) of this paragraph 4
154154 to evaluate compliance of all large animal–feeding operations in the State with State and 5
155155 federal laws and regulations related to air pollutant emissions that apply to large 6
156156 animal–feeding operations in the State. 7
157157
158158 (2) On or before December 15, 2023, the Department of the Environment 8
159159 shall: 9
160160
161161 (i) report its findings from the assessments and evaluations 10
162162 conducted under paragraph (1) of this subsection to the Governor and, in accordance with 11
163163 § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly; and 12
164164
165165 (ii) post the report on its website. 13
166166
167167 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 14
168168 1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 15
169169 this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 16
170170 of no further force and effect. 17
171171