House
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {833421/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {833421/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (113-15)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Carter and Hough)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Bartlett and Shetty)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {643424/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {163825/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
First Reading Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
07/23/2021
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|