Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {433423/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {143423/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (126-5)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {413029/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
First Reading Judiciary
|
|
|