House
|
04/09/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (89-41)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Floor Amendment {863929/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Floor Amendment {413721/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Floor Amendment {193721/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {163823/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {163823/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (92-37)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Floor Amendment {533220/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-88)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Floor Amendment {203121/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (36-91)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Floor Amendment {803727/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (31-93)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Floor Amendment {833023/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (38-89)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Floor Amendment {933624/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (39-91)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {453125/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Hearing 2/14 at 10:00 a.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
First Reading Judiciary
|
|
|