Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (94-42) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Pre-filed |