House
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (106-26)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (38-9)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Hershey) Adopted (39-7)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Feldman) Rejected (31-12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) Rejected (18-25)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {483322/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Sydnor) Adopted (24-20)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {483322/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (104-25)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {783629/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Economic Matters
|
|
|