House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 560 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {723626/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |