Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB883 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/09/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0883*  
  
HOUSE BILL 883 
R6   	2lr1604 
      
By: Delegate Wivell 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2022 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Washington County – Vehicle Emissions Inspection Fees – Distribution 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to remit a certain percent 3 
of certain vehicle emissions inspection and testing fees collected at a facility in 4 
Washington County to the Washington County governing body for the sole purpose 5 
of supplementing funds for improving and maintaining Washington County 6 
highways; and generally relating to the distribution of vehicle emissions inspection 7 
and testing fees collected in Washington County. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9 
 Article – Transportation 10 
Section 23–205 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2012 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Transportation 16 
 
23–205. 17 
 
 (a) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, the Administration and the 18 
Secretary shall set the fee to be charged for each vehicle to be inspected and tested by a 19 
facility. 20 
 
 (2) The fee established under this subsection[: 21 
 
 (i) During the period from January 1, 1995 through May 31, 1997, 22 
may not exceed $12; and 23  2 	HOUSE BILL 883  
 
 
 
 (ii) During the period after May 31, 1997,] may not exceed $14. 1 
 
 (b) The fee shall be collected in a manner established by the Administration and 2 
the Secretary. 3 
 
 (c) (1) [A specific portion of the] EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPH (2) 4 
OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE fee shall be paid to or retained by the Administration to cover 5 
the cost of administration and enforcement of the emissions control program, as provided 6 
in the contract between the contractor and the State. 7 
 
 (2) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL REMIT 45% OF THE INSPECTION 8 
AND TESTING FEES , INCLUDING LATE FEES , COLLECTED AT A FACIL ITY IN 9 
WASHINGTON COUNTY TO THE WASHINGTON COUNTY GOVERNING BODY FOR THE 10 
SOLE PURPOSE OF SUPP LEMENTING FUNDS FOR IMPROVING AND MAINTA INING 11 
WASHINGTON COUNTY HIGHWAYS . 12 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 13 
October 1, 2022. 14