House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {863325/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {553428/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |