Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (117-20) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513125/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |