House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/12/2021 | Pre-filed |