Senate | 04/05/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593029/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |