House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {383920/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |