Senate | 03/15/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 08/18/2021 | Pre-filed |