Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (82-54) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Floor Amendment {423727/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted (93-25) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Floor Amendment {403526/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (43-77) | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |