House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (122-4) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {763829/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-2) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {433122/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |