Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (96-35) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {963827/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/21/2021 | Pre-filed |