House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (121-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {613829/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {573328/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |