House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (126-6) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 10/20/2021 | Pre-filed |