House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Floor Amendment {153224/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {393029/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |