Senate | 04/09/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-1) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {953628/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |