House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Conference Committee Report {653427/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Elfreth and Guzzone)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Wilkins and Long)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {143521/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (127-11)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {643326/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
|
|
|