House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {483327/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |