House | 05/12/2022 | Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Benson) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Senate Rules | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Third Reading Passed (125-0) | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |