House | 04/08/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-15) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/20/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Senate Rules | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |