House
|
03/09/2022
|
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Floor Amendment {953227/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Floor Amendment {123724/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-25)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Floor Amendment {323826/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-29)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Floor Amendment {573027/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (23-22)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {573027/1 (Senator Ready)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Favorable Adopted (30-15)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|