Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (98-29) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {183429/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/29/2021 | Pre-filed |