House | 03/16/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {743220/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/15/2021 | Pre-filed |