Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {823921/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {183823/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {453621/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 2/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {453621/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|