Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 01/08/2022 | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Pre-filed |