Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Motion Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Pre-filed |