Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (127-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/30/2021 | Pre-filed |