Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (127-0) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Senate Rules | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |