Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {853521/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | First Reading Finance |