Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-2) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {503022/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | First Reading Finance |