House | 03/03/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {343022/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/17/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |